MN HF2386 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - Author added Backer
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - Author added Backer
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regional library systems funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Regional library systems funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Author added Backer |
2023-03-13 | House | Author added Engen |
2023-03-09 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Legacy Finance |
2023-03-08 | House | Author added Davids |
2023-03-06 | House | Author added Norris |
2023-03-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF664 (Similar To) 2023-04-11 - Author added Rasmusson