MN HF2381 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Author added Bernardy.
Pending: House Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Author added Bernardy.
Pending: House Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Immunity for underage possession or consumption of alcohol extended to persons assisting another who remains on the scene.
Title
Immunity for underage possession or consumption of alcohol extended to persons assisting another who remains on the scene.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | House | Author added Bernardy. |
2017-03-20 | House | Author added Johnson, C. |
2017-03-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2167 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy