MN HF2373 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 210 04/23/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 210 04/23/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Felony of fraudulent or other improper finance statements extended to include retaliation against a sheriff or county recorder for performance of official duties regarding real property.
Title
Felony of fraudulent or other improper finance statements extended to include retaliation against a sheriff or county recorder for performance of official duties regarding real property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - Passage (Y: 121 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Secretary of State Chapter 210 04/23/12 | |
2012-04-23 | Governor's action Approval | |
2012-04-19 | Presented to Governor | |
2012-04-18 | House | Returned from Senate |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 60-0 |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Special Order |
2012-04-02 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-04-02 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF1874 |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Received from House |
2012-03-29 | House | Bill was passed vote: 121-9 |
2012-03-29 | House | Third reading |
2012-03-29 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-03-01 | House | Second reading |
2012-03-01 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2012-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance |