MN HF2367 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Certifying entities required to timely process visa certification documents.
Title
Certifying entities required to timely process visa certification documents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-03-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF2970 (Similar To) 2020-02-11 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy