MN HF2366 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Author added Moran
Pending: House Higher Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Author added Moran
Pending: House Higher Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hunger Free Campus Act established and designation requirements established, campus food shelves at Minnesota State community and technical colleges required, grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Hunger Free Campus Act established and designation requirements established, campus food shelves at Minnesota State community and technical colleges required, grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Laurie Pryor [D] | Rep. Samantha Vang [D] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] |
Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] |
Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Author added Moran |
2019-03-21 | House | Authors added Lien and Lillie |
2019-03-18 | House | Authors added Kunesh-Podein and Huot |
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Higher Education Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2706 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy