MN HF2360 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Secretary of State Chapter 26
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Secretary of State Chapter 26
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Corrections claim settlement provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Department of Corrections claim settlement provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-15 - House - House: Passage (Y: 79 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-15 - House - House: Passage (Y: 79 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Secretary of State Chapter 26 | |
2021-05-25 | Governor's action Approval | |
2021-05-25 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2021-05-25 | Governor approval | |
2021-05-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2021-05-17 | House | Returned from Senate |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken |
2021-05-16 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-05-16 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2269 |
2021-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2269 on General Orders |
2021-05-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2021-05-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-05-15 | House | Bill was passed |
2021-05-15 | House | Third reading |
2021-05-13 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Saturday, May 15, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | House | Second reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2021-05-10 | House | Motion prevailed |
2021-05-10 | House | Motion to re-refer Ways and Means |
2021-05-10 | House | Motion prevailed |
2021-05-10 | House | Motion to take from table |
2021-05-10 | House | Motion prevailed |
2021-05-10 | House | Motion to lay on the table |
2021-05-10 | House | Third reading |
2021-05-06 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 10, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | House | Second reading |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2021-03-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2269 (Similar To) 2021-05-16 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2360