MN HF2358 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Author added Franson.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Author added Franson.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Youth with disabilities employment transitions provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Youth with disabilities employment transitions provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | House | Author added Franson. |
2017-03-23 | House | Author added Maye Quade. |
2017-03-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1515 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Author added Dziedzic