MN HF235 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Renewable development account renamed and repurposed, solar energy incentives terminated, and money appropriated.
Title
Renewable development account renamed and repurposed, solar energy incentives terminated, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Marion O'Neill [R] | Rep. Jason Metsa [D] | Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] |
Rep. Jim Newberger [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - House - House: Passage (Y: 76 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-09 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 76-49 |
2017-02-09 | House | Third reading as amended |
2017-02-09 | House | Amended |
2017-02-09 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, February 9, 2017 |
2017-01-26 | House | Author added Lucero. |
2017-01-26 | House | Second reading |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2017-01-19 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF214 (Similar To) 2017-02-15 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance