MN HF2343 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Author added Reyer
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Author added Reyer
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Red Lake Nation Tribal College Minneapolis site of Red Lake Band of Chippewa Indians capital improvement funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Red Lake Nation Tribal College Minneapolis site of Red Lake Band of Chippewa Indians capital improvement funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Heather Keeler [D] | Sen. Jason Rarick [R] | Rep. Esther Agbaje [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] | Rep. Patty Acomb [D] | Rep. Kristi Pursell [D] | Rep. Liz Reyer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | House | Author added Reyer |
2023-03-15 | House | Authors added Acomb and Pursell |
2023-03-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Capital Investment |
Same As/Similar To
SF1700 (Similar To) 2023-02-16 - Referred to Capital Investment