MN HF2338 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Author added Loeffler.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Author added Loeffler.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Office of Economic Equity and Opportunity established.
Title
Office of Economic Equity and Opportunity established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Author added Loeffler. |
2017-03-15 | House | Author added Bly. |
2017-03-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1296 (Similar To) 2017-02-23 - Author added Dziedzic