MN HF2335 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Author added Bliss
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Author added Bliss
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Challenged voter process amended, notice of challenge and process to contest challenge provided, challenged ballot use required, penalties provided, and conforming changes made.
Title
Challenged voter process amended, notice of challenge and process to contest challenge provided, challenged ballot use required, penalties provided, and conforming changes made.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Author added Bliss |
2022-02-17 | House | Author added Davids |
2022-01-31 | House | Author added Heintzeman |
2021-03-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF1422 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Joint rule 3.02, returned to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy