MN HF2333 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Author added Maye Quade.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Author added Maye Quade.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Businesses run by East African women loan funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Businesses run by East African women loan funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Karen Clark [D] |
Rep. David Bly [D] | Sen. Erin Maye Quade [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Author added Maye Quade. |
2017-03-15 | House | Author added Bly. |
2017-03-14 | House | Authors added Moran, Lee, and Clark. |
2017-03-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2030 (Similar To) 2017-03-13 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy