MN HF2322 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Author added Lislegard
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Author added Lislegard
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Canisteo Flood Mitigation Project public safety, property, and regional water quality threat mitigation funding provided; bonds issued; and money appropriated.
Title
Canisteo Flood Mitigation Project public safety, property, and regional water quality threat mitigation funding provided; bonds issued; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | House | Author added Lislegard |
2021-04-09 | House | Author added Igo |
2021-03-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Capital Investment |
Same As/Similar To
SF2286 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Authors added Bakk; Eichorn