MN HF2296 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Municipalities street impact fee charging authorized.
Title
Municipalities street impact fee charging authorized.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-03-04 | House | Returned by Chair to Government Operations |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred by Chair to Subcommittee on Local Government |
2020-02-11 | House | Authors added Cantrell and Elkins |
2019-03-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF2442 (Similar To) 2019-03-18 - Author added Hoffman