MN HF228 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Historic Fort Snelling improvement funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Historic Fort Snelling improvement funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Bennett |
2019-02-13 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-01-24 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |