MN HF2276 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 228 04/23/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 228 04/23/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Advanced diagnostic imaging services operator accreditation required.
Title
Advanced diagnostic imaging services operator accreditation required.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Secretary of State Chapter 228 04/23/12 | |
2012-04-23 | Governor's action Approval | |
2012-04-20 | Presented to Governor | |
2012-04-19 | House | Returned from Senate |
2012-04-19 | Senate | Consent Calendar: Third reading Passed vote: 65-0 |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on Consent Calendar SF1811 |
2012-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2012-04-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2012-04-16 | Senate | Received from House |
2012-04-05 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 122-0 |
2012-04-05 | House | Third reading as amended |
2012-04-05 | House | Amended |
2012-04-05 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-03-12 | House | Second reading |
2012-03-12 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2012-02-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Finance |