MN HF2267 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Long
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Carpet product stewardship program provided, and report required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Carpet product stewardship program provided, and report required.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseAuthor added Long
2019-03-20HouseReferred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
2019-03-20HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-07HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF2300 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback