MN HF2260 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Authors added Johnson and Mahoney
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Authors added Johnson and Mahoney
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Congress and the President of the United States memorialized to amend federal veterans cemetery law to expand eligibility for burial in state veterans cemeteries developed with federal funding to include allied Hmong-American and Lao-American veterans of America's Secret War in Laos.
Title
Congress and the President of the United States memorialized to amend federal veterans cemetery law to expand eligibility for burial in state veterans cemeteries developed with federal funding to include allied Hmong-American and Lao-American veterans of America's Secret War in Laos.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | House | Authors added Johnson and Mahoney |
2012-02-29 | House | Second reading |
2012-02-29 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2012-02-20 | House | Authors added Gruenhagen and Benson, M. |
2012-02-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans Services Division |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF2260&ssn=0&y=2011 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF2260&version=0&session=ls87 |