MN HF2258 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-26 - Authors added Fischer, Lee, and Claflin
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-26 - Authors added Fischer, Lee, and Claflin
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Conservation materials use prohibited, and money appropriated.
Title
Conservation materials use prohibited, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Anne Claflin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Authors added Fischer, Lee, and Claflin |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2229 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance