MN HF2245 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mortgage and deed of trust temporary exception sunset extended.
Title
Mortgage and deed of trust temporary exception sunset extended.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2021-04-22 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1807 |
2021-03-22 | House | Second reading |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2021-03-15 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2021-03-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1807 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Secretary of State, Filed