MN HF2234 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Home and community-based services systemic critical incident review team established, adult foster care and community residential setting licensing provisions clarified, substance use disorder treatment requirements modified, councils and committees extended, provider-controlled and own-home settings clarified, and chemical health pilot program obsolete language repealed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home and community-based services systemic critical incident review team established, adult foster care and community residential setting licensing provisions clarified, substance use disorder treatment requirements modified, councils and committees extended, provider-controlled and own-home settings clarified, and chemical health pilot program obsolete language repealed.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-09HouseSecond reading
2023-03-09HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2023-03-06HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
2023-02-27HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1900 (Similar To) 2023-03-13 - Second reading

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback