MN HF2232 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Single-use plastic sale, offering for sale, or provisions banned by hotels; and civil penalties provided.
Title
Single-use plastic sale, offering for sale, or provisions banned by hotels; and civil penalties provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2022-01-31 | House | Author added Feist |
2021-03-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2534 (Similar To) 2021-05-14 - Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy