MN HF2218 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Author added Poston
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Author added Poston
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Right to carry without a permit provided, and optional permit to carry provided.
Title
Right to carry without a permit provided, and optional permit to carry provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | Author added Poston |
2021-03-17 | House | Author added Mekeland |
2021-03-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF275 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Author added Dornink