MN HF2209 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus environment and natural resources finance bill.
Title
Omnibus environment and natural resources finance bill.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Jean Wagenius [D] | Rep. Jack Considine [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
Rep. John Persell [D] | Rep. Samantha Vang [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2019-04-25 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2314 |
2019-04-12 | House | Second reading |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-04-10 | House | Authors added Wagenius, Considine, Lee, Persell, and Vang |
2019-04-04 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2314 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - House conferees Hansen; Persell; Fischer; Becker-Finn; Nelson, N.