MN HF2199 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Author added Bliss
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Author added Bliss
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Students in alternative program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Students in alternative program funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Samantha Vang [D] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] |
Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Paul Marquart [D] | Rep. Kaela Berg [D] | Rep. Erin Koegel [D] |
Rep. Tim Miller [R] | Rep. Ami Wazlawik [D] | Rep. Matt Bliss [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Bliss |
2022-02-17 | House | Authors added Koegel, Miller, and Wazlawik |
2021-03-17 | House | Authors added Mariani, Lee, Youakim, Fischer, Marquart and Berg |
2021-03-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1845 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Author added Newton