MN HF2173 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Mille Lacs Band of Chippewa Indians law enforcement modified, and requirements for Tribes to exercise concurrent law enforcement jurisdictional authority modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mille Lacs Band of Chippewa Indians law enforcement modified, and requirements for Tribes to exercise concurrent law enforcement jurisdictional authority modified.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-20HouseSecond reading
2023-03-20HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2023-03-15HouseAuthor added Finke
2023-02-21HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF2251 (Similar To) 2023-03-22 - Second reading

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback