MN HF2171 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commissioner of health directed to convene working groups to examine health disparities and educational achievement links for American Indian children and children of color, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Commissioner of health directed to convene working groups to examine health disparities and educational achievement links for American Indian children and children of color, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] | Rep. Tina Liebling [D] | Rep. Ruth Richardson [D] |
Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Sen. Tou Xiong [D] | Sen. Alice Mann [D] |
Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2265 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy