MN HF217 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Author added Carlson
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Author added Carlson
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increase Teachers of Color Act strengthened, teachers of color and American Indian teachers in Minnesota percentage increase sought, reports required, and money appropriated.
Title
Increase Teachers of Color Act strengthened, teachers of color and American Indian teachers in Minnesota percentage increase sought, reports required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Carlson |
2022-02-28 | House | Author added Pinto |
2021-03-25 | House | Authors added Hanson, J.; Berg and Greenman |
2021-03-09 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2021-03-04 | House | Author added Liebling |
2021-03-01 | House | Author added Boldon |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Hollins |
2021-02-22 | House | Authors added Mariani, Frazier, and Noor |
2021-02-15 | House | Author added Her |
2021-02-11 | House | Author added Olson, L. |
2021-02-10 | House | Authors added Lee and Vang |
2021-02-01 | House | Author added Fischer |
2021-01-28 | House | Author added Moller |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance |
2021-01-25 | House | Authors added Edelson, Youakim, Davnie, Becker-Finn, Keeler, Feist, and Jordan |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF446 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Referred to Education Finance and Policy