MN HF217 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Author added Moller
Pending: House Higher Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Author added Moller
Pending: House Higher Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Campus sexual assault policies affirmative consent standards required, sexual violence grant program established, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Campus sexual assault policies affirmative consent standards required, sexual violence grant program established, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Author added Moller |
2019-01-24 | House | Authors added Wazlawik, Vang, Dehn, Noor, and Bernardy |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred by Chair to Higher Education Finance and Policy Division |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF187 (Similar To) 2019-01-17 - Referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy