MN HF2166 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Author added Huot
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Medical cannabis maximum supply distributed extended from 30-day to 90-day supply.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical cannabis maximum supply distributed extended from 30-day to 90-day supply.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Huot
2019-03-11HouseAuthor added Theis
2019-03-07HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF727 (Similar To) 2019-01-31 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback