MN HF2156 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Author added Masin
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Author added Masin
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Conversion therapy with children and vulnerable adults prohibited, medical assistance coverage prohibited, and misrepresentation of conversion therapy services or products prohibited.
Title
Conversion therapy with children and vulnerable adults prohibited, medical assistance coverage prohibited, and misrepresentation of conversion therapy services or products prohibited.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Author added Masin |
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Fischer |
2022-03-07 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2022-03-03 | House | Division action, return to Health Finance and Policy |
2022-03-03 | House | Authors added Wazlawik; Frederick; Carlson; Acomb; Xiong, J. |
2022-02-28 | House | Author added Boldon |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred by Chair to Preventive Health Policy Division |
2021-05-03 | House | Author added Feist |
2021-04-13 | House | Author added Keeler |
2021-04-06 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2021-03-25 | House | Authors added Moller and Berg |
2021-03-22 | House | Author added Morrison and Stephenson |
2021-03-15 | House | Authors added Youakim and Elkins |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1871 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders, pursuant to rule 5.1