MN HF2144 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Camp Ripley Military Museum grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Camp Ripley Military Museum grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Kresha [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division |
2019-03-20 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2019-03-19 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Theis |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred by Chair to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2574 (Similar To) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy