MN HF2140 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Authors added Jurgens and Backer
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Authors added Jurgens and Backer
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal constraints; a resolution memorializing Congress to call a convention to propose amendments to the United States Constitution to impose fiscal constraints on the federal government, limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and limit the terms of office for its officials and for members of Congress.
Title
Fiscal constraints; a resolution memorializing Congress to call a convention to propose amendments to the United States Constitution to impose fiscal constraints on the federal government, limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and limit the terms of office for its officials and for members of Congress.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Authors added Jurgens and Backer |
2022-02-21 | House | Authors added Urdahl, Davids, Mekeland, and Anderson |
2022-02-14 | House | Author added Bahr |
2022-02-10 | House | Authors added Pierson, Erickson, Daniels, Green, Raleigh, and Koznick |
2022-02-01 | House | Author added Baker |
2022-01-31 | House | Author added Mueller |
2021-04-29 | House | Author added Pfarr |
2021-04-06 | House | Authors added Quam, Poston, Lucero and Dettmer |
2021-03-25 | House | Authors added Bennett, Heintzeman, and Burkel |
2021-03-23 | House | Author added Novotny |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF2464 (Similar To) 2021-05-05 - Author added Eichorn