MN HF214 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-15 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-15 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
St. Louis County; Voyageur Country All-Terrain Vehicle Trail funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
St. Louis County; Voyageur Country All-Terrain Vehicle Trail funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-03-12 | House | Returned by Chair to Ways and Means |
2019-01-24 | House | Author added Franson |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF336 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Capital Investment