MN HF213 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Runbeck
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Runbeck
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School counseling provisions modified to encourage armed forces career options.
Title
School counseling provisions modified to encourage armed forces career options.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Runbeck |
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Poston |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Policy |
2019-01-24 | House | Author added Haley |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF2800 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Author added Wiger