MN HF213 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - Author added Backer.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - Author added Backer.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nonemergency medical transportation and ambulance service rate reductions eliminated.
Title
Nonemergency medical transportation and ambulance service rate reductions eliminated.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Sen. Dan Schoen [D] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] |
Rep. Jeff Backer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | Author added Backer. |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2015-02-05 | House | Author stricken Norton. |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF177 (Similar To) 2015-01-20 - Referred to Finance