MN HF2126 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Authors added Fabian, O'Neill, Daudt, and Neu
Pending: House Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Authors added Fabian, O'Neill, Daudt, and Neu
Pending: House Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Net zero energy emissions project established, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Net zero energy emissions project established, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Authors added Fabian, O'Neill, Daudt, and Neu |
2019-03-14 | House | Authors added Boe, Mekeland, Swedzinski, and Baker |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred by Chair to Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1039 (Similar To) 2019-04-01 - Author stricken Marty