MN HF2111 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Author added Morrison
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Reach Out and Reach Minnesota program grant funding provided, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reach Out and Reach Minnesota program grant funding provided, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseAuthor added Morrison
2019-03-12HouseReferred by Chair to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division
2019-03-07HouseReferred by Chair to Education Finance Division
2019-03-07HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF2298 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Author added Nelson

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback