MN HF2096 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Author added Lueck
Pending: House Property and Local Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Family-owned resort tax provisions modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family-owned resort tax provisions modified.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseAuthor added Lueck
2019-03-08HouseReferred by Chair to Property and Local Tax Division
2019-03-07HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Taxes

Same As/Similar To

SF1725 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Referred to Taxes

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback