MN HF2094 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Direct support service providers reimbursement rate modified.
Title
Direct support service providers reimbursement rate modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Liebling [D] | Rep. Joe Schomacker [R] | Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] |
Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2019-04-03 | House | Author added Loeffler |
2019-03-28 | House | Author added Long |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2285 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy