MN HF2093 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-18 - Authors added Haley and Boe
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-18 - Authors added Haley and Boe
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Farmer disaster recovery loan program expanded, and retroactive effective date provided.
Title
Farmer disaster recovery loan program expanded, and retroactive effective date provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] | Rep. Gene Pelowski [D] | Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] | Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] |
Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Debra Kiel [R] |
Rep. Barb Haley [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Authors added Haley and Boe |
2019-03-14 | House | Author added Kiel |
2019-03-13 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture and Food Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF2225 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 4 03/18/2019