MN HF2081 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Author added Olson, L.
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Author added Olson, L.
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medical assistance required to cover recuperative care services.
Title
Medical assistance required to cover recuperative care services.
Sponsors
Rep. Patty Acomb [D] | Rep. Danny Nadeau [R] | Rep. Steve Elkins [D] | Rep. Joe Schomacker [R] |
Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Liz Reyer [D] | Rep. Andrew Myers [R] |
Rep. Liz Olson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Author added Olson, L. |
2023-03-15 | House | Author added Myers |
2023-03-13 | House | Author added Reyer |
2023-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1951 (Similar To) 2023-02-20 - Referred to Health and Human Services