MN HF2080 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-15 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-15 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Assisted living facilities and services changes made.
Title
Assisted living facilities and services changes made.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2023-02-27 | House | Author added Zeleznikar |
2023-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1969 (Similar To) 2023-03-16 - Author added Putnam