MN HF2080 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Education debt relief grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Education debt relief grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2017-05-12 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on Calendar for the Day |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF943 |
2017-05-10 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 12, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | House | Second reading |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2017-03-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2017-03-07 | House | Author added Bernardy. |
2017-03-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education and Career Readiness Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF943 (Similar To) 2017-05-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 89