MN HF2068 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Author added Bennett
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Author added Bennett
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sanneh Foundation funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Sanneh Foundation funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Clardy [D] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Samakab Hussein [D] |
Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Author added Bennett |
2023-02-27 | House | Author added Youakim |
2023-02-21 | House | Authors added Hassan, Huot, and Hussein |
2023-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2147 (Similar To) 2023-03-02 - Author added Duckworth