MN HF2067 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Authors added Fischer, Persell, Becker-Finn, Sandell, Wagenius, Lee, and Heintzeman
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Dry cleaner fees modified, limited transfer of sales tax revenues allowed, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dry cleaner fees modified, limited transfer of sales tax revenues allowed, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseAuthors added Fischer, Persell, Becker-Finn, Sandell, Wagenius, Lee, and Heintzeman
2019-03-21HouseAuthor added Daniels
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Christensen
2019-03-11HouseAuthors added Halverson and Lippert
2019-03-04HouseReferred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
2019-03-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF1949 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Taxes

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback