MN HF2061 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Authors added Persell and Claflin
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

University of Minnesota; Forever Green Agriculture Initiative funding provided, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

University of Minnesota; Forever Green Agriculture Initiative funding provided, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseAuthors added Persell and Claflin
2019-03-15HouseReferred by Chair to Legacy Finance Division
2019-03-14HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-03-04HouseReferred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
2019-03-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF2680 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback