MN HF2051 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance; model regulation conformity changes made, and federally conforming changes made to supplemental Medicare coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; model regulation conformity changes made, and federally conforming changes made to supplemental Medicare coverage.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseHF indefinitely postponed
2019-05-10HouseBills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
2019-05-09HouseReferred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2313
2019-05-07HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 09, 2019
2019-05-02HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 06, 2019
2019-04-10HouseSecond reading
2019-04-10HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2019-04-04HouseJoint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-03-28HouseMotion prevailed
2019-03-28HouseMotion to re-refer Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-03-28HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 1, 2019
2019-03-20HouseSecond reading
2019-03-20HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-03-14HouseAuthor added Elkins as chief author
2019-03-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Commerce

Same As/Similar To

SF2313 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 26 05/17/2019

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback