MN HF205 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Author added Boe
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Author added Boe
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disabled veteran homestead exclusion spousal benefit modified.
Title
Disabled veteran homestead exclusion spousal benefit modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Author added Boe |
2019-04-01 | House | Authors added Davids, Petersburg, Nornes, Backer, Marquart, Grossell, Bernardy, and Pierson |
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Robbins |
2019-03-21 | House | Authors added Franson, Mekeland, Haley, Gruenhagen, and Lillie |
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Poston |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2019-02-14 | House | Author added Heinrich |
2019-01-24 | House | Author added Brand |
2019-01-22 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF114 (Similar To) 2019-01-28 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Taxes