MN HF2040 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
St. Peter Regional Treatment Center Minnesota sex offender program facilities Phase 2 improvement funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
St. Peter Regional Treatment Center Minnesota sex offender program facilities Phase 2 improvement funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-03-19 | House | Returned by Chair to Ways and Means |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2123 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Capital Investment